HILPERTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities run for the benefit of the local community. Facilities available to hire for use by community groups, e.g. Pre-school, uniform groups, performing arts groups, WI, Dance groups(children and adult). Rooms available for hire by individuals for parties/charity events etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 01 May 1963: Standard registration
- HILPERTON VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Jarvis | Trustee | 13 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
SONJA KOTEVSKA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MISS PAM TURNER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ERNIE CLARK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RACHAEL HALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHEILA SAWYER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £54.56k | £50.57k | £64.44k | £64.53k | £56.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.90k | £42.21k | £53.33k | £51.65k | £50.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.43k | £32.30k | £14.35k | £3.16k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 24 April 2024 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 24 April 2024 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 03 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 03 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 30 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 31 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10TH FEBRUARY 1950
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HILPERTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hilperton Village Hall
Whaddon Lane
Hilperton
Trowbridge
Wiltshire
BA14 7RN
- Phone:
- 01225769765
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window