Financial history HOLT VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 305527
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £39.51k £38.11k £35.15k £40.04k £45.37k
Total expenditure £31.25k £18.87k £25.53k £56.07k £27.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £18.53k £2.67k N/A N/A