Trustees HOLT VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 305527
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SUSAN ENNIS Chair 02 February 2019
None on record
Carol Foreman Trustee 06 January 2025
None on record
Mike Jordan Trustee 06 January 2025
None on record
Sue Bolden Trustee 01 October 2016
None on record
ROBERT PAGE Trustee 13 January 2013
None on record
MRS JO HOPKINS Trustee 12 March 1995
None on record
GRAHAM HILL Trustee 12 March 1984
None on record
TIM MASON Trustee
None on record