HORNINGSHAM MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Committee fund-raising events and hire of hall to keep the village hall in good condition for the use of all the village communities such as school, luncheon and welcome clubs, youth club, cricket & football teams etc and hire of hall for the wider community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 30 April 1963: Standard registration
- HORNINGSHAM HALL (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Michael Dean | Chair | 04 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cherry Truluck Halpin | Trustee | 12 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Leslie Windess | Trustee | 04 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
James Richard Oborne | Trustee | 30 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.93k | £15.73k | £28.45k | £15.69k | £13.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.79k | £16.47k | £33.57k | £11.22k | £14.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | £10.00k | £18.53k | £3.72k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 29TH NOVEMBER 1960
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
HORNINGSHAM AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
131 Scotland
Horningsham
Warminster
BA12 7NH
- Phone:
- 07541211732
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window