THE KEEVIL CLUB AND INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a meeting place for meetings, activities, etc for all residents of the village and surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 10 February 1964: Standard registration
- KEEVIL VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL LENAERTS | Chair | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah J Dow | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Jarvis Champlin | Trustee | 25 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Paul Lamy Goodwin | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Meatyard | Trustee | 25 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Caroline Anne Munday | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN LILIAN PARTRIDGE | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN FREDERICK TUCKER | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
NORMAN HARRY FRANCIS OWEN | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jane Knowles | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY TERENCE WEST | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA TUCKER | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Gosling | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|||||
MRS PAT BARTHOLOMEW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.72k | £2.48k | £10.67k | £9.49k | £7.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.14k | £4.76k | £2.95k | £5.08k | £5.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 17TH SEPTEMBER 1963 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 9 OCTOBER 2002 as amended on 20 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF KEEVIL AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS AND IN PARTICULAR FOR USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
KEEVIL AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
49A MARTINS ROAD
KEEVIL
TROWBRIDGE
BA14 6NA
- Phone:
- 01380 870443
- Email:
- patbartholomew@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window