LACOCK VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Village hall providing facility for Lacock.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 16 September 1968: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Durrant | Chair | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
JESSICA TROUGHT | Trustee | 02 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
PETER SHAW | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
KAY GREAVES | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY JEAN HAYDEN | Trustee | 17 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
AARON LAWS | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Heather Shepherd | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Joy Tickell | Trustee | 27 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Edwards | Trustee | 03 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Gary Steer | Trustee | 02 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Michael Belcher | Trustee | 01 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.89k | £35.16k | £25.00k | £17.54k | £23.65k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.84k | £9.66k | £18.40k | £19.93k | £21.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.10k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 15TH MAY 1967 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 2 MARCH 2015
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LACOCK
Contact information
- Address:
-
Dolphins
The Wharf
Lacock
CHIPPENHAM
Wiltshire
SN15 2PQ
- Phone:
- 01249730679
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window