VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF THE MEMORIAL HALL FOR USE BY THE RESIDENTS OF LUDGERSHALL AND THE IMMEDIATE VICINITY.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £9,000 from 2 government contract(s) and £9,500 from 3 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 28 December 1962: Standard registration
- Ludgershall Memorial Hall (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pauline Deirdre Lillywhite | Chair | 09 February 2023 |
|
|||||||
Jamieson Christopher Swallow | Trustee | 22 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Simon David Dix | Trustee | 22 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Ian Robert Beveridge | Trustee | 22 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Vanessa Dixon | Trustee | 20 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Dale Lansley-Smith | Trustee | 20 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Edward Tudor Venn | Trustee | 20 April 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Linda Poultney | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|||||||
Rev FREDERICK ERROL WILLIAMS | Trustee | 09 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||
ROSALEEN MULJI | Trustee |
|
||||||||
KRYSTYNA LOVELESS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.87k | £35.16k | £31.40k | £18.47k | £32.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.13k | £18.06k | £31.26k | £32.09k | £32.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £2.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £9.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.00k | £32.00k | £4.00k | N/A | £9.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 18 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 14TH SEPTEMBER 1951.
Charitable objects
VILLAGE HALL.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF LUDGERSHALL AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1A Central Street
Ludgershall
SP11 9RA
- Phone:
- 07940733081
- Email:
- chantelle120514@gmail.com
- Website:
-
ludgershallmemorialhall.webplus.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window