Financial history BRADENSTOKE VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 305543
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £10.73k £13.81k £32.79k £9.68k £8.34k
Total expenditure £14.68k £12.63k £16.23k £6.26k £10.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £416 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £27.76k N/A N/A