Financial history NORTH WRAXALL VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 305555
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.23k £5.49k £14.37k £14.37k £14.07k
Total expenditure £15.25k £5.63k £14.92k £14.92k £13.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £6.60k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A