Financial history THE OAKSEY VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 305557
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £12.63k £32.50k £10.97k £31.72k £11.67k
Total expenditure £13.04k £16.81k £17.38k £43.67k £14.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.39k £21.27k £5.17k £5.60k N/A