Trustees STEEPLE ASHTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 305575
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Clive William Little | Chair | 10 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Justine Elizabeth Grace | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Francesca Buffery-King | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marian Joy Little | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Stevens | Trustee | 03 April 2005 |
|
|
||||
GEOFF HYATT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN HERBERT BERRETT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.