SUTTON BENGER RECREATION FIELD AND VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sports and recreation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Swindon
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 23 August 1962: Standard registration
- SUTTON BENGER VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- SUTTON BENGER RECREATION GROUND (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Margaret Potts | Chair | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul Rex Stocker | Trustee | 24 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennie Mills | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steven Pellant | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Phillip Llewellyn | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Davis | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dudley Van Lelyveld | Trustee | 26 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Ratcliffe | Trustee | 01 May 2010 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.39k | £26.29k | £49.90k | £58.22k | £56.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.37k | £23.50k | £42.71k | £60.42k | £52.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.00k | £2.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE DATED 17 AUGUST 1922. SCHEME DATED 6TH MARCH 1995.
Charitable objects
RECREATION GROUND FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF SUTTON BENGER,SEAGRY AND DRAYCOT IN THE COUNTY OF WILTS FOR THE PURPOSE OF EXERCISE AND RECREATION.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Manor Farm Drive
Sutton Benger
Chippenham
Chippenham
Wilts
SN15 4RW
- Phone:
- 07415861502
- Email:
- suttonbengerhall@gmail.com
- Website:
-
suttonbenger.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window