Trustees THE WOODFORD VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 305597

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT PAUL GULLIVER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Nigel Richard Wood CBE | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Edward Foster | Trustee | 13 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alison Burrows | Trustee | 10 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Down | Trustee | 22 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rae Owen | Trustee | 25 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
HELEN CONSTANCE HOSIER | Trustee | 16 January 2009 |
|
|
||||
FIONA HELEN PATTERSON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.