1ST CASTLE CARY SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scouting, with active Squirrel, Beaver, Cub and Scout groups members of both sexes welcome
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
21 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 02 October 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carl Rostrup | Chair | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Purchase | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Cook | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Whitchurch | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Patricia Fordrey | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Briony Hull | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Simmons | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Gledhill | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Ann Turner | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lianne Bourgoin | Trustee | 21 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bob Smith | Trustee | 11 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
ZOE MITCHELL | Trustee | 17 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM WAKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KARA PINNIONS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.30k | £20.40k | £6.03k | £14.33k | £19.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.47k | £3.38k | £8.25k | £13.44k | £20.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 July 2024 | 161 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 19TH JUNE 1959 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955
Charitable objects
1ST CASTLE CARY SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
CASTLE CARY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Buttery Cottage
The Old Threshing Mill
Pylle
SHEPTON MALLET
Somerset
BA4 6SP
- Phone:
- 01749838885
- Email:
- bobddc2@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window