1ST KEYNSHAM SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 305626
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Keynsham Scouting seeks to provide young people with opportunities to participate in adventurous outdoor activities, learn team-building skills and develop new friendships. It is co-educational so that youngsters can develop together and meet the aims of Scouting. Membership is open to all young people and adults, regardless of ability, who are prepared to accept Scouting's principles.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £106,322
Total expenditure: £96,180

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Bath And North East Somerset

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 December 1963: Standard registration
  • 05 January 1995: Removed
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FIRST KEYNSHAM (ST JOHN'S) GROUP OF BOY SCOUTS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Leonard Bridges Chair
None on record
Peter Andrew Tamblin Trustee 15 October 2024
None on record
Alan Alexander Glasgow Trustee 15 July 2024
None on record
Deon Peter Alan Lowe Trustee 17 July 2023
None on record
Matthew Jackson Trustee 17 July 2023
None on record
Daniel Martin Sawyer Trustee 27 September 2021
None on record
Lee Mark Lodder Trustee 22 September 2020
None on record
Nicola Sanders Trustee 25 September 2017
None on record
Antony Kevin French Trustee 25 September 2017
None on record
Alan Charles Sanders Trustee
None on record
John Nicholas Balcombe Trustee
None on record
Ian Michael Carter Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £61.25k £66.13k £107.44k £92.80k £106.32k
Total expenditure £79.56k £57.79k £85.07k £83.31k £96.18k
Income from government contracts N/A £2.40k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 £21.64k £22.53k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 21 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 10 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 10 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 26 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 26 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 21 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 21 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED 1 JUNE 1949
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SCOUT GROUP.
Area of benefit
KEYNSHAM AND DISTRICT
Registration history
  • 11 December 1963 : Standard registration
  • 05 January 1995 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
1st Keynsham Scouts
Scout HQ
Mayfields
Keynsham
BS31 1BW
Phone:
07929 721311