ALCOMBE GUIDES AND EXMOOR SCOUTS HEADQUARTERS FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hut provision for Scouts and Guides
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 25 November 1968: Standard registration
- ALCOMBE SCOUTS AND GUIDES (Previous name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Terence Venner | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Christopher Austin | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Stjohn | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
John James Vincent Bonar | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Hatch | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Darren Kendall | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
John Glover | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAULINE BENNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GILL GRIGGS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.67k | £20.47k | £1.18k | £1.14k | £1.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.17k | £814 | £2.65k | £2.33k | £2.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.47k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 July 2024 | 157 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 May 2022 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14TH AUGUST 1967 AND ASSINGMENT DATED 23RD AUGUST 1967
Charitable objects
JOINT UNITS OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION AND THE GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
ALCOMBE
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 DEER VIEW
MINEHEAD
TA24 6LW
- Phone:
- 01643708919
- Email:
- a.j.d.c@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window