SOMERSET COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our purpose is to actively engage and support young people in their personal development, empowering them to make a positive contribution to society.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 12 December 1966: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Graham Ashford | Chair | 21 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Sharp | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Ann Wilson | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Scarlett Halima Atherton | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JAMES MARLOW | Trustee | 17 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Neil Charles Truby | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Sedgebeer | Trustee | 23 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon Paul Lacey | Trustee | 23 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence Alexander Wilson | Trustee | 23 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Arthur Lewis | Trustee | 23 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £205.40k | £83.02k | £54.32k | £78.47k | £464.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £188.91k | £62.91k | £51.66k | £94.10k | £432.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £29.67k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 May 2024 | 98 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 May 2024 | 98 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL,INTELLECTUAL,SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS,AS INDIVIDUALS,AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL,NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF SOMERSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tangier Scout & Guide Centre
Castle Street
TAUNTON
Somerset
TA1 4AS
- Phone:
- 03303411850
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window