Trustees SOMERSET COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL
Charity number: 305634

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Graham Ashford | Chair | 21 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Stephen John Sharp | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Ann Wilson | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Scarlett Halima Atherton | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JAMES MARLOW | Trustee | 17 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Neil Charles Truby | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Sedgebeer | Trustee | 23 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon Paul Lacey | Trustee | 23 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lawrence Alexander Wilson | Trustee | 23 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Arthur Lewis | Trustee | 23 September 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.