ST ANDREW'S (YEOVIL) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St. Andrew's Scout Group comprises 4 sections, Squirrels, Beavers, Cubs and Scouts. Each section meets one evening a week during school term times, with a number of weekend activities throughout the year, either for a few hours or for the whole weekend; camps for example. During these times the youngsters, boys and girls, work towards achieving badges for a diverse number of activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 10 August 1972: Standard registration
- ST ANDREWS SCOUT GROUP (Working name)
- ST ANDREW'S (YEOVIL) SCOUTS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REBECCA BYRNE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Kirsty Lowe | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Farrell | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Wilkes | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Tricia Darley | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
PHILIPPA MARY WANNELL | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW HURLEY | Trustee | 08 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA KING | Trustee | 16 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Simon John Merrett | Trustee | 30 July 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.89k | £27.16k | £19.33k | £26.68k | £31.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.86k | £13.53k | £20.10k | £30.31k | £35.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL,INTELLECTUAL,SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS,AS INDIVIDUALS,AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL,NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Osborne Cottages
Pound Road
Horton
ILMINSTER
Somerset
TA19 9QT
- Phone:
- 07990780387
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window