Trustees ST ANDREW'S (YEOVIL) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 305645

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REBECCA BYRNE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Kirsty Lowe | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Farrell | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Wilkes | Trustee | 17 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Tricia Darley | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
PHILIPPA MARY WANNELL | Trustee | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW HURLEY | Trustee | 08 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA KING | Trustee | 16 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Simon John Merrett | Trustee | 30 July 2007 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.