1ST BURY ST EDMUNDS (MAYORS OWN) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides teaching and training to Beavers; Cubs and Scouts in everyday skills; canoeing; camping; hikeing, and many other outdoor activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 13 May 1970: Standard registration
- 1ST BURY ST EDMUNDS (MAYOR'S OWN) GROUP (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON HOWES | Chair | 10 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Rosamund De Cova | Trustee | 08 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Lammin | Trustee | 10 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Hancock | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Laura Lambell | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Lambell | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.73k | £26.88k | £15.41k | £17.25k | £16.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.52k | £7.24k | £18.09k | £18.79k | £22.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.38k | £19.91k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 June 2024 | 124 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2021
(These accounts |
25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 7TH NOVEMBER 1969 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955.ROYAL CHARTER 14TH JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP
Area of benefit
BURY ST.EDMUNDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 St. Olaves Road
BURY ST. EDMUNDS
Suffolk
IP32 6RN
- Phone:
- 07904194527
- Email:
- sanandreas0611@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window