SUDBURY DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities as per the Scout Association Policy Organisation and Rules
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Suffolk
Governance
- 03 July 1963: Standard registration
- SUDBURY DISTRICT SCOUTS COUNCIL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Vincent Quattrucci | Chair | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
JULIE CHRISTINE PENNEY | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Alan Cummins | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE JULIA SUTTON | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cathy Challis | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Anne Spraggons | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bryan Vaughan Mayles | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Andrew Roy Cutting | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Margaret Mullan | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Barry Remblance | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charmain Southgate | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
John Wiseman | Trustee | 20 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
JAN JENNINGS | Trustee | 29 November 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.83k | £30.91k | £37.46k | £55.23k | £48.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.99k | £31.88k | £38.18k | £48.47k | £47.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 04/01/1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Meeting Field
Long Melford
SUDBURY
CO10 9JZ
- Phone:
- 07919001928
- Email:
- TREASURER@WYZKEY.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window