1ST ASH VALE SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Typical Scouting activities including camping and trips for Beavers,Cubs and Scouts
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
- Surrey
Governance
- 16 August 1961: Standard registration
- 1ST ASH VALE GROUP OF BOY SCOUTS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Malcolm Simpson | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Vicky Brodie | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christa Scott-Fernandez | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Lucas | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Dibsdall | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jessica Muirhead | Trustee | 16 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Magdalena Jackson | Trustee | 20 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MOYLE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA VERONICA ELSA SIMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Linda Christine Moyle | Trustee |
|
||||||
DOREEN GARRETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS CHRIS FITZPATRICK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.26k | £14.63k | £15.46k | £26.71k | £28.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.00k | £9.16k | £12.06k | £21.75k | £24.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.75k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 December 2023 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 December 2023 | 33 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 30 JANUARY 1951 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 18 JUNE 1935.
Charitable objects
PURPOSES OF 1ST ASH VALE GROUP OF BOY SCOUTS.
Area of benefit
ASH VALE
Contact information
- Address:
-
1st Ash Vale Scout Head Quarters
6 Wood Street
Ash Vale
ALDERSHOT
Hampshire
GU12 5JG
- Phone:
- 00000000000
- Email:
- treasurer@1stashvale.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window