WALTON-ON-THE-HILL SCOUTS AND GUIDES SUPPORTERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports the furtherance of Scouting and Girl Guiding for able and disabled youngsters in the parish of Walton-On-The-Hill and neighbourhood by providing suitable social facilities for community use. The HQ is the venue for weekly meetings and provides storage for camping and other equipment. It is used by Dyscover, a charity for people with aphasia and by a pre-school soft play group.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Surrey
Governance
- 21 September 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AVRIL BARBARA FARLEY | Trustee | 05 December 2005 |
|
|
||||
JULIA FIONA BODDY | Trustee | 01 March 2004 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.05k | £12.87k | £4.69k | £3.91k | £7.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.90k | £2.07k | £24.14k | £4.27k | £7.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2022 | 325 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31 JULY 1962
Charitable objects
PURPOSES OF THE WALTON-ON-THE-HILL SCOUTS AND GUIDES SUPPORTERS ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
WALTON-ON-THE-HILL AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 WEST DRIVE
TADWORTH
KT20 5PA
- Phone:
- 07770917733
- Email:
- AVRIL_FARLEY@HOTMAIL.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window