Boidier Hurst Scout Campsite

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide camping facilities for youth organisations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 09 November 1961: Standard registration
- BOIDIERHURST SCOUT CAMP SITE (Working name)
- EPSOM, EWELL AND LEATHERHEAD (AND DISTRICTS) BOY SCOUTS LOCAL ASSOCIATIONS (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Henry | Trustee | 05 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Chris Rose | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Baker | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Emily Page | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Ian Kidd | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shona Rose | Trustee | 19 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karl James Nicholas Mr | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Ian Smalley | Trustee | 22 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAUL VLAEMINCK | Trustee | 01 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
John Humphreys | Trustee | 01 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA STEVENS | Trustee | 01 February 2014 |
|
|||||
Dr Benita Middleton | Trustee | 01 February 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.75k | £80.79k | £34.34k | £38.78k | £62.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.92k | £23.35k | £31.59k | £43.80k | £64.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.29k | £12.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30 JULY 1952 BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED DATED 18 JUNE 1935 as amended on 13 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
PURPOSES OF THE EPSOM, EWELL AND LEATHERHEAD AND DISTRICTS BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATIONS
Area of benefit
EPSOM, EWELL AND LEATHERHEAD
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 HOWARD ROAD
BOOKHAM
LEATHERHEAD
KT23 4PW
- Phone:
- 01372454107
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window