8TH/14TH EPSOM (ST BARNABAS AND ST JOSEPH'S) AIR SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to promote the development of the young to achieve their full physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potentials, as individuals, as responsible citizens and as members of their local, national and international communities. We achieve this by providing an enjoyable and attractive scheme of progressive training, based on the Scout Promise and Law and guided by adult leadership.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 21 November 1968: Standard registration
- EPSOM AIR SCOUTS (Working name)
- 14TH EPSOM (ST JOSEPH'S) AIR SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lindsay Hill-Bennett | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Paul Petersen | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Robert Nathan Coleby | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon James Pearce | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard William Park | Trustee | 26 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Justin Manly | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Jane del Nevo | Trustee | 08 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Luke Jennings | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|||||
PAUL DAWSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HOWARD PARK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.32k | £33.45k | £35.60k | £47.88k | £48.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.17k | £18.11k | £27.44k | £55.65k | £76.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.81k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 March 2023 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 March 2023 | 42 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 14TH NOVEMBER, 1967
Charitable objects
UNIT OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF EPSOM AND EWELL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Group Scout Leader
8th/14th Epsom Air Scouts Group
Concorde Hall
The Footpath
Horton Hill
Epsom
- Phone:
- 01372 742502
- Email:
- group@epsomairscouts.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window