1ST CLAYGATE GIRL GUIDES COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Guiding Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 09 March 1962: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Martin Saunders | Chair | 17 June 2009 |
|
|
||||
Antony Glyn Evan Thomas | Trustee | 23 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Iwona Stubbs | Trustee | 28 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.48k | £17.51k | £6.95k | £3.88k | £3.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.89k | £3.50k | £8.29k | £7.78k | £5.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £11.33k | £16.91k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 03 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 29 SEPTEMBER 1958 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1938
Charitable objects
PURPOSES OF THE 1ST. CLAYGATE GUIDE COMPANY
Area of benefit
CLAYGATE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Claygate Guiding Headquarters
Foxwarren
Claygate
ESHER
Surrey
KT10 0JZ
- Phone:
- 00
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window