1ST MOLESEY SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of 1st Molesey Scout Group are as a unit of the Scout Association. The aim of the Scout Association is to promote the development of young people in achieving their full physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potentials, as individuals, as responsible citizens and as members of their local, national and international communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Surrey
Governance
- 30 September 1964: Standard registration
- 1ST MOLESEY BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bruce Burrowes | Chair | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Tran Hadfield | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jo Jethwa | Trustee | 19 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
TRACY HARVEY | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tiana Humphries | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tej Jethwa | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jim Emmines | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Max Harvey | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chris Armstrong | Trustee | 06 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Liam Quinn | Trustee | 22 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
FIONA ELIZABETH AXTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN DUNCAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER SCHILD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.59k | £59.35k | £94.26k | £161.53k | £139.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.33k | £39.83k | £95.80k | £153.73k | £126.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.30k | £9.72k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 June 2024 | 132 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 June 2024 | 132 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 March 2022 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 March 2022 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5TH DECEMBER 1927
Charitable objects
1ST MOLESEY BOY SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
EAST AND WEST MOLESEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
1st Molesey Scout Group
193 Walton Road
WEST MOLESEY
Surrey
KT8 2DY
- Phone:
- 0345 300 1818
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window