Trustees 1ST MOLESEY SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 305729

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bruce Burrowes | Chair | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Tran Hadfield | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jo Jethwa | Trustee | 19 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
TRACY HARVEY | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tiana Humphries | Trustee | 15 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tej Jethwa | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jim Emmines | Trustee | 09 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Max Harvey | Trustee | 08 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chris Armstrong | Trustee | 06 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Liam Quinn | Trustee | 22 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
FIONA ELIZABETH AXTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN DUNCAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER SCHILD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.