GUILDFORD TOWN DISTRICT GIRL GUIDES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to provide a building for young people in guiding also meeting place for older people for recreation, education activities and pleasure. To provide meeting place for training of guiders.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 17 September 1968: Standard registration
- GUILDFORD GUIDE ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Guildford Guide Headquarters (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucy Wallis | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Dubery | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Madeleine Nicholas | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Peach | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Dyer | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANN PIERCE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.61k | £1.34k | £987 | £3.48k | £4.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.51k | £3.70k | £3.15k | £4.71k | £3.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 5TH JANUARY 1967 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1938
Charitable objects
UNIT OF THE GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
STOKE PARK, GUILDFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Girl Guides Association
Guide Hut
Nightingale Road
GUILDFORD
Surrey
GU1 1ER
- Phone:
- 01483 505816
- Email:
- guildfordguidehq@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window