Financial history 1ST MERROW SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 305753
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £45.59k £55.13k £55.42k £52.89k £45.75k
Total expenditure £27.83k £21.31k £29.46k £47.28k £47.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £40.39k £21.33k N/A N/A