1ST MERROW SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the group are as a unit of the Scout Association. The Aim of The Scout Association is to promote the development of young people in achieving their full physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potentials, as individuals, as responsible citizens and as members of their local national and international communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 26 August 1964: Standard registration
- 1ST MERROW BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Jonathan Whitcombe | Chair | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Travers Day | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Eli Kelynack | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Mariner | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Marie Grove | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Paul Tetley | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Arthur Llewelyn Jones | Trustee | 19 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Jane Ritchie | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.59k | £55.13k | £55.42k | £52.89k | £45.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.83k | £21.31k | £29.46k | £47.28k | £47.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £40.39k | £21.33k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 23RD MARCH 1964 UPON THE TRUSTS OR THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955
Charitable objects
1ST MERROW BOY SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
MERROW
Contact information
- Address:
-
1st Merrow Scout Group
Bushy Hill Drive
GUILDFORD
GU1 2SH
- Phone:
- 0000000000
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window