HORLEY DISTRICT GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Girl Guiding Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 10 August 1962: Standard registration
- HORLEY EAST GUIDES (Working name)
- HORLEY WEST GUIDES (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela Hammond | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Marsh | Trustee | 16 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rosemarie Belcher | Trustee | 30 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.99k | £14.56k | £5.63k | £4.83k | £8.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.22k | £10.34k | £10.78k | £4.53k | £4.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 6 NOVEMBER 1926
Charitable objects
PURPOSES OF THE HORLEY DISTRICT GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
HORLEY AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Empire Hall
Victoria Road
HORLEY
Surrey
RH6 7AW
- Phone:
- 07551232054
- Email:
- ehhorley@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window