Trustees 1ST ASHTEAD (PELHAM) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 305770
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alan Minister Trustee 20 September 2024
None on record
Neil Thornton Trustee 20 September 2024
None on record
Simon Horner-Long Trustee 22 September 2023
None on record
Kim Rachel Reed Trustee 22 September 2023
None on record
Andrew Marlow Trustee 06 May 2022
None on record
FELICITY ANNE HEWITT Trustee 20 January 2013
None on record
SARAH MINISTER Trustee 30 January 2012
None on record