1ST LINGFIELD AND DORMANSLAND SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 305777
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Follows the principles of scouting as laid down by the Scout Association.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £47,147
Total expenditure: £53,285

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 November 1966: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • 1ST LINGFIELD AND DORMANSLAND BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ivan Edward Ericsson Chair 01 January 2016
None on record
Robert Fisher Trustee 01 June 2020
None on record
Lisa Roach Trustee 01 June 2020
None on record
Tanya Louise Boakes Trustee 01 January 2019
None on record
Karin Fell Trustee 01 May 2016
None on record
IAN BLACKFORD Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £44.12k £31.73k £35.54k £20.47k £47.15k
Total expenditure £50.33k £5.65k £41.36k £22.92k £53.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 February 2022 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 February 2022 21 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
3 Jenners Close
LINGFIELD
RH7 6EQ
Phone:
07879486455