1ST NORMANDY SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The 1st Normandy Scout Group provides scouting challenges, opportunites and activities for boys and girls in Normandy. The Group comprises two Beaver Colonies for 6-8 year olds, a Cub Pack for 8-10.5 year olds, a Scout Troop for 10.5-14.5 year olds and an Explorer Unit for older young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 01 September 1961: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ruth Charlotte Slaney | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Robert Holland | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
CAROL ANNE SHIRTLIFF | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Louise Hurst | Trustee | 29 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Schaefer | Trustee | 20 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT PETER HATFIELD | Trustee | 29 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Peter Robert Hurst Mr | Trustee | 15 February 2012 |
|
|||||
JEREMY EDWARD SCOTT PHOENIX | Trustee | 15 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
ALEXIS LOUIS JOHN SHIRTLIFF | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Jonathan Arnold GASSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID LOWTHER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.52k | £30.53k | £30.34k | £30.37k | £32.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.68k | £17.95k | £20.70k | £20.70k | £58.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.19k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 04 JAN 1912 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 28 MAR 1949 AS AMENDED ON 18 FEB 1959 AS AMENDED ON 05 MAY 1967 AS AMENDED ON 19 JUL 1991 AS AMENDED ON 08 FEB 2018 AS AMENDED ON 30 APR 2019 AS AMENDED ON 12 FEB 2020
Charitable objects
PURPOSES OF THE 1ST NORMANDY SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
NORMANDY
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 ASH HILL ROAD
ASH
ALDERSHOT
GU12 6AD
- Phone:
- 07500059446
- Email:
- chairman@1stnormandy.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window