EARLSWOOD (2ND REIGATE) ST JOHN'S SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity exists to provide a Scout Group for local children aged from 6 to 18.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
27 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- 17 August 1961: Standard registration
- EARLSWOOD (2ND REIGATE) ST JOHN'S BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Johannes van Hoof | Chair | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Diana Davies | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|||||
ADRIAN MALCOLM JACKSON | Trustee | 16 November 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.28k | £11.67k | £23.11k | £48.11k | £35.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.05k | £11.50k | £16.43k | £42.03k | £33.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 March 2024 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 March 2024 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE DATED 29 OCTOBER 1959 TRUST DEED DATED 5 JANUARY 1961 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED DATED 1955
Charitable objects
PURPOSES OF THE EARLSWOOD (2ND REIGATE) ST. JOHN'S BOY SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
EARLSWOOD, REIGATE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Scout HQ
2 EARLSWOOD ROAD
Redhill
RH1 6HE
- Phone:
- 07801046064
- Email:
- chair@2ndreigate.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window