5TH REIGATE SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The 5th Reigate Scout Group is registered with the Scout Association, whose aim is to promote the development of young people in achieving their full physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potential. The Group aims to achieve this by providing an enjoyable and attractive scheme of progressive training, with a programme for Squirrels, Beavers, Cubs, Scouts and Explorer Scouts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 23 April 1968: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Loraine Mountain | Chair | 12 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Isard | Trustee | 03 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Redman | Trustee | 07 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Peter James Wolsey | Trustee | 07 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Dawn Martin | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vincent Potter | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Graham David Mountain | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Ian Pinto | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
David John Mountain | Trustee | 16 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
PETER SALVAGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.61k | £30.25k | £21.46k | £25.59k | £79.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.92k | £13.44k | £25.62k | £35.38k | £83.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.24k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 04 JAN 1912 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 28 MAR 1949 AS AMENDED ON 18 FEB 1959 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 05 MAY 1967 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 19 JUL 1991 AS AMENDED ON 08 FEB 2018 AS AMENDED ON 30 APR 2019 AS AMENDED ON 12 FEB 2020
Charitable objects
UNIT OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION
Area of benefit
REIGATE
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 Westway Gardens
REDHILL
RH1 2JB
- Phone:
- 01737771395
- Email:
- team.gsl@5thrscouts.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window