8TH ASHFORD (MIDDLESEX) SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
we offer a full range of scouting activities to local children aged between 6 and 14.5
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 07 January 1964: Standard registration
- 8TH ASHFORD (MIDDLESEX) BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Anne Daniel | Trustee | 17 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD MEDDELTON | Trustee | 14 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
JULIE REED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LOUISE SEARS TREASURER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HOWARD WEETCH SL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIOBHAN EDGAR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.90k | £26.52k | £37.52k | £29.14k | £30.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.17k | £10.28k | £19.38k | £24.71k | £24.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 February 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 February 2021 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 04 JAN 1912 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 28 MAR 1949 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 18 FEB 1959 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 05 MAY 1967 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER DATED 19 JUL 1991 AS AMENDED ON 08 FEB 2018 AS AMENDED ON 30 APR 2019 AS AMENDED ON 12 FEB 2020
Charitable objects
8TH ASHFORD (MIDDLESEX) BOY SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
ASHFORD AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 PRINCES ROAD
ASHFORD
TW15 2LT
- Phone:
- 01784253724
- Email:
- admin@8thashfordscouts.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window