OATLANDS SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
general scouting activities including camping and outdoor adventure pursuits
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 25 February 1965: Standard registration
- OATLANDS BOY SCOUTS GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Evans | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Hare | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Eaton | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laurelle Wellinger | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Dent | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Casey | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Harriet Bronwen Fisher | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Fisher | Trustee | 16 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Anne Armitage | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Sara Brooksbank | Trustee | 30 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.34k | £29.60k | £31.68k | £46.37k | £49.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.61k | £11.52k | £43.99k | £37.27k | £49.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £18.24k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 March 2022 | 143 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 March 2022 | 143 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER DATED 1912 AS AMENDED 1949, 1959, 1967 AND 1991
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
WALTON-ON-THAMES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Scout Hut
Pantile Road
Weybridge
KT13 9PY
- Phone:
- 07810 883099
- Email:
- chair@oatlandsscouts.org.uk
- Website:
-
oatlandsscouts.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window