Trustees 1ST WALTON-ON-THAMES SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 305804

Charity reporting is up to date (22 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Flanders | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alastair Duke | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louie Bowers | Trustee | 04 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bryan Stone | Trustee | 04 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bernard Wolff | Trustee | 03 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cara Carter | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
GILES HAGGERTY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.