Trustees COUNTY OF SURREY EAST GUIDE ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 305818
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Beverly Heywood-Jones | Chair | 02 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Anne Corrance | Trustee | 22 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lorna Ellen Smith | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Anne Luff | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sonia Naughton | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Ann Louise Fowles | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mary Elizabeth Zoeller | Trustee | 11 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH JANE COLLIER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.