9TH BEXHILL SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide Scouting activities for any young person from age 4 to age 18. To be a hub for any adult wishing to re connect with Scouting via the Scout Network.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
Governance
- 05 May 1965: Standard registration
- 9TH BEXHILL BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mandie Louise Dugdale | Trustee | 11 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Gill | Trustee | 11 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Grice | Trustee | 18 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joanna Ansermoz | Trustee | 02 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAUL PLIM | Trustee | 22 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.87k | £14.05k | £11.59k | £19.84k | £41.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.42k | £3.53k | £10.51k | £17.98k | £31.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 30 March 2023 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 03 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 09 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ASSIGNMENT DATED 5TH FEBRUARY 1965 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955.
Charitable objects
9TH BEXHILL BOY SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
BEXHILL
Contact information
- Address:
-
9th Bexhill Scout Hall
Wainwright Road
Bexhill-on-sea
East Sussex
TN39 3UR
- Phone:
- 01424213225
- Website:
-
WWW.SENLACSCOUTS.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window