1ST BREDE SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES, EDUCATION AND TRAINING, RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES, SPORT AND RECREATION, ENVIRONMENTAL
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Total income includes £20,241 from 4 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Sussex
- Kent
Governance
- 25 November 1968: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Adkin | Chair | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Dean | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Simmons | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Tomlins | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kate Tomlins | Trustee | 24 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA LUSH | Trustee | 10 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
LUCIANO FRIGE | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Anthony King | Trustee | 06 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Cherry McCleery | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
PETER CLARK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.09k | £4.10k | £16.34k | £2.67k | £22.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.92k | £4.17k | £27.53k | £3.65k | £7.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £20.24k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 107 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 473 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 838 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 838 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 March 2022 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 31ST JANUARY 1968 UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955
Charitable objects
SCOUT GROUP (UNIT OF THE SCOUT ASSOCIATION)
Area of benefit
BREDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Scout Association
Stubb Lane
Brede
RYE
East Sussex
TN31 6EH
- Phone:
- 07714257561
- Email:
- brede.scouts@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window