BRIGHTON & HOVE DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 305826
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The aim of Brighton & Hove Scout District, as part of the Scout Association, is to actively engage and support young people in their personal development, empowering them to make a positive contribution to society.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £105,914
Total expenditure: £97,833

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Brighton And Hove

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 February 1964: Standard registration
  • 09 May 2016: Funds received from 305422 HILLSIDE SCOUT CAMP
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • BRIGHTON BOY SCOUTS LOCAL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
  • BRIGHTON DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER JOHN ELLIFF Chair
None on record
Neil Trevor Legget Trustee 18 June 2024
None on record
Rosie Fisher Trustee 01 December 2023
None on record
Glen Downs Trustee 01 August 2023
None on record
Anne Claxton Trustee 15 March 2023
None on record
Christopher Mark Denham Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
TIMOTHY JAMES THORLEY Trustee 01 January 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £134.30k £89.24k £143.28k £150.54k £105.91k
Total expenditure £109.89k £81.32k £78.69k £88.86k £97.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £16.33k £40.04k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 06 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
66 OVERHILL DRIVE
BRIGHTON
BN1 8WJ
Phone:
01273 501852