44TH BRIGHTON SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Scout Group.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Brighton And Hove
Governance
- 07 November 1966: Standard registration
- 44TH BRIGHTON BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynn Suzanne Watts | Chair | 29 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ewan Stoddart | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Douglas William Mason | Trustee | 24 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Tiltman | Trustee | 03 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
DR Michael Bassett | Trustee | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
David Andrew Allen | Trustee | 14 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
GERALDENE NEWMAN | Trustee | 23 June 2007 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.87k | £31.57k | £32.67k | £14.29k | £20.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.92k | £11.51k | £59.15k | £31.09k | £12.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.33k | £20.71k | £3.08k | £1.20k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 21 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 09 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ASSIGNMENT DATED 3RD AUGUST UPON THE TRUSTS OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1955
Charitable objects
44TH BRIGHTON SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
BRIGHTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
44th Brighton Scout Group
21 Old London Road
BRIGHTON
BN1 8XR
- Phone:
- 07977501703
- Email:
- mike@creativesilicon.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window