Trustees MID SUSSEX DISTRICT SCOUTS
Charity number: 305841

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Brooks | Trustee | 26 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Shorrocks | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Guy McClelland | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Anderson | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Johnson | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Scholfield | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Frederick Thomas | Trustee | 20 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan Paul Dyke | Trustee | 20 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Hudson | Trustee | 04 January 2021 |
|
|||||
Michael Larcombe | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tony Pearson | Trustee | 27 January 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.