Accounts and annual returns 1ST EAST GRINSTEAD SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 305850
Charity reporting is up to date (98 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 09 May 2025 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 May 2024 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 13 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window