Trustees 4TH EAST GRINSTEAD (ST LUKES) SCOUT GROUP
Charity Number: 305851

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tony Parsons | Chair | 20 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Emily Brooks | Trustee | 08 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Devine | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colin Smith | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Gould | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Mewis | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Roberts | Trustee | 03 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
JILL BECKINGHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.