1ST ROBERTSBRIDGE SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY PROVIDES SCOUTING ACTIVITIES AND HAS ACTIVE BEAVER, CUBS AND SCOUTS SECTIONS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
Governance
- 19 September 1963: Standard registration
- 19 August 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 26 March 2013: Re-registered
- 1ST ROBERTSBRIDGE BOY SCOUT GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Toby Michael Walsh | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neil James Gofton | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Longhurst | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alice Calvert | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Annette Dewis | Trustee | 12 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Ashby | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Giles Stokoe | Trustee | 06 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Jarvis | Trustee | 24 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
HELEN ELIZABETH PEARSON | Trustee | 03 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jo Rainsbury | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.50k | £20.65k | £16.88k | £5.65k | £13.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.01k | £5.15k | £7.11k | £10.54k | £11.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £18.91k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 1MTH JULY 1954 UPON THE TRUSTSS OF THE BOY SCOUTS ASSOCIATION TRUST DEED 1935.
Charitable objects
1ST ROBERTSBRIDGE BOY SCOUT GROUP
Area of benefit
ROBERTSBRIDGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Church Terrace
Church Lane
ROBERTSBRIDGE
East Sussex
TN32 5PH
- Phone:
- 07977996551
- Website:
-
WWW.SENLACSCOUTS.ORG.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window